HB0180 (CH0062)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Medical Marijuana - Caregiver - Affirmative Defense

Sponsored by:

Delegate Glenn

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62


Synopsis:Establishing that it is an affirmative defense to a prosecution for the possession of marijuana or the possession of specified drug paraphernalia that the marijuana or drug paraphernalia was intended for medical use by an individual with a specified debilitating medical condition for whom the defendant is a specified caregiver; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Glenn, Morhaim, Anderson, Carter, Conaway, Mitchell, Oaks, B. Robinson, and Vallario
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0580
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1809 Session: 2012 1st Special Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Health -see also- Mental Health
Notices
Patients
Trials
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(5-601, 5-619)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {492717/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (92-40)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.