HB0183

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Correctional Training Commission - Members

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly, K.

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Altering the membership of the Correctional Training Commission.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates K. Kelly, Anderson, Clippinger, Dumais, Mitchell, Simmons, Valderrama, and Waldstreicher
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0441
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
State Government - Personnel
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Correctional Officers
Statutes:Article - Correctional Services
(8-204)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {572917/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (129-9)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.