HB0189 (CH0404)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company Employees

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cluster

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404


Synopsis:Authorizing the Secretary of State Police to accept a criminal background investigation performed on behalf of an armored car company in place of a specified criminal history records check performed by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services under specified circumstances.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Cluster, Szeliga, Fisher, Folden, Ghrist, S. Howard, Jacobs, Krebs, W. Miller, and Ready
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0261
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0283 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Criminal Background Investigations
Guns
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
State Police, Department of
Weapons -see also- Guns
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Public Safety
(5-305)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:41 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20151/30/2015First Reading Judiciary
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20153/19/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/19/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments {302817/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/20/20153/19/2015Third Reading Passed (137-0)49
Senate3/23/20153/20/2015First Reading Judicial Proceedings47A
4/6/20154/6/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/6/20153/30/2015Favorable with Amendments {418570/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/7/20153/31/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)58
House4/10/20154/4/2015House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (139-0)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:41 P.M.