HB0192

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program Fund

Sponsored by:

Delegate Mitchell

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Increasing fees for service of process of papers by a sheriff; requiring that $10 of the fees be distributed to a fund established for the Rental Allowance Program of the Department of Housing and Community Development; establishing the Rental Allowance Program Fund; specifying that the Fund is a special, nonlapsing fund; providing that the money in the Fund may be used only for specified purposes; adding the Fund to the list of funds the interest earnings of which are exempt from accruing to the General Fund of the State; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Mitchell, Anderson, Branch, Bromwell, Carter, Clippinger, McHale, Vaughn, M. Washington, and Wilson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0156
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0413 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary
Broad Subject(s):Economic and Community Development
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Narrow Subject(s):Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Interest
Leases and Rent
Process Serving
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Sheriffs
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(7-402)
Article - Housing and Community Development
(4-1401, 4-1403, 4-1407)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(6-226)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
1/29/20131/29/2013Hearing cancelled
1/30/20131/30/2013Reassigned to Judiciary16
1/31/20131/31/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.