HB0193 (CH0374)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption

Sponsored by:

Chair, Economic Matters Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374


Synopsis:Exempting an individual from the requirement to not be subject to compulsory school attendance and to have withdrawn from school in order to be eligible to obtain a high school diploma by examination if the individual participates in a GED Option Program administered by the State Department of Education that creates a pathway to a high school diploma by examination for certain currently enrolled high school English language learner students under the age of 21 years.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Economic Matters Committee and Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0043
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee Hearing
Ways and Means
Finance  View Committee Hearing
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Exemptions
Language -see also- Communication; Electronic Comm; Telecomm
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Public Schools
Students
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(11-808)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 3:30 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20181/18/2018First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
1/26/20181/26/2018Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
3/7/20183/7/2018Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable Report Adopted42
Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 42
3/13/20183/10/2018Second Reading Passed44
3/14/20183/11/2018Third Reading Passed (133-0)45
Senate3/15/20183/15/2018First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Finance
4/2/20183/28/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)60
House4/4/20183/26/2018Returned Passed60
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.