HB0197

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points

Sponsored by:

Delegate Anderson

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


Synopsis:Requiring a court to notify the Motor Vehicle Administration of a specified violation of the Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law; requiring the Chief Judge of the District Court and the Administrative Office of the Courts, in conjunction with the Administration, to establish specified procedures; requiring that a specified number of driver's license points be assessed against an individual who is convicted of a violation of the Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0271
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Office of the Courts
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
District Courts
Drivers' Licenses
Hearings
Litter
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(10-110)
Article - Transportation
(16-402, 26-305)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
1/29/20131/29/2013Hearing cancelled
1/30/20131/30/2013Reassigned to Judiciary16
1/31/20131/31/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable with Amendments {492514/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (107-28)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings35

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.