HB0206

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Continuing the State Acupuncture Board, the State Board of Dietetic Practice, and the State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending to July 1, 2025, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the boards; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0237
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Acupuncturists
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Occupational Therapists
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:Article - Health Occupations
(10-502, 1A-502, 5-101, 5-202, 5-302, 5-305, 5-502)
Article - State Government
(8-403)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2012)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/20/20132/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {536084/1 Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/22/20132/22/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)33
Senate2/25/20132/25/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs32
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.