HB0224 (CH0826)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education - AmeriCorps Program Participants - In-State Tuition

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lierman

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826


Synopsis:Waiving the residency requirement for in-State tuition purposes at a public senior higher education institution in the State for an individual who has completed an AmeriCorps Program in the State; and establishing specified circumstances when a student is responsible for paying in-State tuition.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Lierman
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Residency -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship
Students
Tuition
Volunteers -see also- Maryland Service Corps
Statutes:Article - Education
(15-106.9)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Appropriations
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/9/20173/9/2017Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate McConkey) Rejected (48-88)42
Third Reading Passed (86-50)42
Senate3/10/20173/10/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs41
3/13/20173/13/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20173/29/2017Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/5/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed (43-3)59
House4/6/20173/30/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.