HB0225 (CH0155)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155


Synopsis:Requiring specified licensing units and boards to give credit to former service members for relevant military training, education, and experience in connection with the issuance of occupational and professional licenses, certificates, and registrations; repealing and recodifying provisions of law regarding the renewal of occupational or professional licenses and the completion of continuing education or continuing competency requirements for specified members of an armed force deployed outside the State; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Anderson, Barkley, Barve, Branch, Braveboy, Dumais, Feldman, Frush, Glass, Hubbard, Hucker, Jameson, A. Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Lee, Love, Malone, McHale, Minnick, Mitchell, Morhaim, Olszewski, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Rudolph, James, Frank, Wilson, Krebs, Szeliga, McComas, Weir, DeBoy, Wood, Impallaria, O'Donnell, Elliott, Bromwell, Beitzel, A. Miller, Hammen, Pendergrass, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Kach, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, Reznik, Tarrant, V. Turner, Burns, Davis, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Vaughn, Schuh, Schulz, and Stifler
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0273
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Economic Matters  View Committee Hearing
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Business Regulation and Occupations
Education - Miscellaneous
Health Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Armed Forces -see also- Militia; Veterans
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Criminal Background Investigations
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Emergency Medical Services
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Financial Regulation, Division of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Militia
Mortgages
Notices
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Veterans
Statutes:Article - Business Regulation
(2.5-101 through 2.5-108, 2-111)
Article - Education
(10-101, 13-501, 13-516, 15-113, 6-101.1)
Article - Financial Institutions
(11-612.2)
Article - Health Occupations
(1-701 through 1-706)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {126789/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {464438/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (139-0)67
Passed Enrolled67
Post Passage4/17/20134/17/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.