HB0226 (CH0003)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3


Synopsis:Altering the Maryland renewable energy portfolio standard program to include a specified amount of energy derived from offshore wind energy; prohibiting the portion of the renewable energy portfolio that represents offshore wind energy from applying to retail electricity sales by a supplier in excess of specified limits; defining "offshore wind renewable energy credit"; establishing an application process for proposed offshore wind energy projects; establishing the Clean Energy Technical Education Program Task Force; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Hucker, Anderson, Arora, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Bobo, Branch, Braveboy, Busch, Carr, Clippinger, Conway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Feldman, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Hammen, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Ivey, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sophocleus, Stein, Summers, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0275
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Environment
Utility Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Alternative Energy Sources
Appropriations
Assessments
Associations -see also- Cooperative Associations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Colleges
Construction
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Res; Fuel; Power Plants
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Escrow Accounts
Farmland
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Hearings
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
High Voltage Lines
Interest
Investments -see also- Securities
Leases and Rent
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Minorities -see also- Women
Notices
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Public Information
Public Service Commission
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Shore Erosion
Small Business
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Natural Resources
(8-1102)
Article - Public Utilities
(7-208, 7-701, 7-703, 7-704, 7-704.1, 7-704.2, 7-705)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(6-226)
Article - State Government
(9-20C-01 through 9-20C-04)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Economic Matters
1/22/20131/22/2013Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {943995/130
Special Order until later today (Delegate Davis) Adopted 30
Favorable with Amendments {943995/1 Report Adopted30
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 30
2/20/20132/20/2013Floor Amendment (Delegate Bates) {473225/1 Rejected (43-90)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate Serafini) {263624/1 Rejected (45-90)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {813429/1 Rejected (46-87)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {563928/1 Rejected (44-89)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {253220/1 Rejected (50-83)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {563526/1 Rejected (45-86)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {793724/1 Rejected (44-86)31
Floor Amendment (Delegate Myers) {193722/1 Rejected (44-89)31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/22/20132/22/2013Third Reading Passed (86-48)33
Senate2/25/20132/25/2013First Reading Finance32
2/26/20132/26/2013Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {567175/138
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted38
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable with Amendments {567175/139
Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 39
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable with Amendments {567175/1 Report Adopted40
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {843924/1 Rejected (19-27)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {923325/1 Rejected (13-31)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {433328/1 Rejected (17-28)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) {513326/1 Rejected (16-30)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {123325/1 Rejected (16-29)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {333526/1 Rejected (14-31)40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20133/8/2013Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {663620/2 Rejected (14-31)41
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {513922/1 Rejected (16-28)41
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {833528/1 Rejected (13-33)41
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (30-15)41
House3/18/20133/15/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments48A
Third Reading Passed (88-48)48A
Passed Enrolled48A
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.