HB0233

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study Health and Safety Standards for Rental Housing in Prince George's County PG 410-18

Sponsored by:

Prince George's County Delegation

Status:

In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation


Synopsis:Establishing the Task Force to Study Health and Safety Standards for Rental Housing in Prince George's County; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding health and safety standards for rental housing in Prince George's County; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report by September 30, 2018, and a final report by January 31, 2019, to the members of the Prince George's County delegation to the General Assembly; terminating the Act after June 30, 2019; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:Prince George's County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Generally
Economic and Community Development
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Environmental Health -see also- Pollution
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Hearings
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Leases and Rent
Prince George's County
Public Information
Reports
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 18, 2018 11:46 A.M.