HB0235 (CH0361)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Property Tax - Valuation of Residential Real Property - Database

Sponsored by:

Delegate McComas

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to maintain a database, available to the public on the Department's Web site, that relates to the valuation of specified real property in the State and includes specified information.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates McComas, Afzali, Cluster, Dwyer, Fisher, Frank, George, Glass, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kach, Krebs, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, Norman, Schulz, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Vitale, and Wood
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0789 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Electronic Government
Public Information
Real Property
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(14-201)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {525569/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation52
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.