HB0242

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jacobs

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Authorizing the Circuit Administrative Judge of the Second Circuit to establish a Truancy Reduction Pilot Program in the juvenile court in Kent County; and making specified provisions relating to a Truancy Reduction Pilot Program in specified counties applicable to Kent County.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Jacobs, Arentz, and Smigiel
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0282
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Judiciary   View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Juvenile Law
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Circuit Courts
Judges
Juvenile Causes
Kent County
Students
Truancy
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/17/20141/17/2014First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2/10/20142/10/2014Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/11/20142/11/2014Favorable Report Adopted25
Second Reading Passed25
2/13/20142/13/2014Third Reading Passed (121-0)27
Senate2/14/20142/14/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings26
4/1/20144/1/2014Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20143/24/2014Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/4/20143/26/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/5/20143/29/2014Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.