HB0244 (CH0089)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Correctional Services - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Subpoena Power

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89


Synopsis:Authorizing the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to subpoena, administer an oath to, and examine under oath any person under specified circumstances; repealing the subpoena power of the Commissioner of Correction; establishing penalties for failure to appear or refusal to testify in response to a subpoena issued by the Secretary; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Perjury
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Subpoenas
Statutes:Article - Correctional Services
(2-113.1, 3-204)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings35
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.