HB0245 (CH0090)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90


Synopsis:Requiring a health care practitioner involved in the delivery or care of a substance-exposed newborn to make a report to a local department of social services except under specified circumstances; establishing that a report made under the Act does not create a specified presumption; requiring the Department of Human Resources to submit a preliminary report to the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2014, and a final report on or before October 1, 2015; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Resources)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Child Abuse and Neglect
Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Human Resources, Department of
Juvenile Causes
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Services -see also- Welfare
Substance Abuse
Statutes:Article - Family Law
(5-704.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
1/25/20131/25/2013Hearing cancelled
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {812619/1 Report Adopted45
Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 45
3/14/20133/14/2013Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {123726/347
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted47
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (43-88)47
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {223424/1 Rejected (45-87)47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20133/16/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)49
Senate3/20/20133/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings49
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.