HB0246

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Juvenile Law - Placement Visits - Video Conferencing

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary


Synopsis:Authorizing a juvenile counselor to use video conferencing to satisfy a requirement that the juvenile counselor visit a child at the child's placement at specified intervals under specified circumstances.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Juvenile Law
Narrow Subject(s):Counselors -see also- Social Workers
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(3-8A-25)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
1/25/20131/25/2013Hearing cancelled
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Unfavorable Report by Judiciary

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.