HB0249 (CH0489)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits

Sponsored by:

Delegate McMillan

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489


Synopsis:Changing the interest rate paid on a security deposit at the end of a tenancy under a residential lease when an evicted or ejected tenant makes a timely written demand for return of the security deposit; altering the annual interest rate paid by a mobile home park owner on a security deposit at the end of a tenancy; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to maintain on its Web site a specified list or calculator; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates McMillan and O'Donnell
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0345
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0045 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters   View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Real Property
Narrow Subject(s):Electronic Government
Eviction
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Landlord and Tenant -see also- Eviction; Leases & Rent; etc.
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Reports
Security Deposits
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/17/20141/17/2014First Reading Environmental Matters
1/20/20141/20/2014Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2/10/20142/10/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2/11/20142/11/2014Favorable with Amendments {660517/1 Report Adopted25
Second Reading Passed with Amendments25
2/13/20142/13/2014Third Reading Passed (120-0)27
Senate2/14/20142/14/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings26
4/4/20144/4/2014Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/4/20143/26/2014Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20143/28/2014Third Reading Passed (45-1)62
House4/7/20144/1/2014Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.