HB0250 (CH0363)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Remedy and Priority of Restitution

Sponsored by:

Delegate Smigiel

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363


Synopsis:Expanding the applicability of specified appeal rights from a victim of a violent crime to a victim of a nonviolent crime; authorizing a victim to appeal to the Court of Special Appeals from a specified final order; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Smigiel, Afzali, Eckardt, Frank, Hershey, Jacobs, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, W. Miller, Oaks, and Parrott
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0666 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Narrow Subject(s):Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Court of Special Appeals
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Restitution
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Statutes:Article - Criminal Procedure
(11-103, 11-606, 11-617)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {102311/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.