HB0251 (CH0736)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and Consent

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 736


Synopsis:Requiring a county board of education to provide age-appropriate instruction on the meaning of "consent" which is defined as the unambiguous and voluntary agreement between all participants in each physical act within the course of interpersonal relationships, including respect for personal boundaries; and requiring the county board to provide age-appropriate instruction on the meaning of "consent" as part of the Family Life and Human Sexuality curriculum beginning in the 2018-2019 school year.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Kelly, Atterbeary, Barve, Brooks, Cullison, Fennell, Flanagan, Folden, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, Jones, Kaiser, Korman, Lafferty, J. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Morales, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Simonaire, Tarlau, Valderrama, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0402
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1560 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Boundaries
Curriculum
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Human Rights
Public Schools
Sexual Offenses
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-441)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 21, 2018 10:36 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/19/20181/19/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20182/22/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/23/20182/23/2018Favorable with Amendments {585569/1 Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed with Amendments33
2/27/20182/27/2018Third Reading Passed (117-17)35
Senate2/28/20182/28/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs36
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 736

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.