HB0254 (CH0092)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before Release

Sponsored by:

Allegany County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92


Synopsis:Requiring a police officer or an agent acting on behalf of a law enforcement agency in Allegany County to keep custody of an arrested person from the time of arrest until the person is committed by lawful authority to a State or local correctional facility, released from custody, or in the custody of another police officer; authorizing a correctional officer in Allegany County assigned to supervise and transport inmates to keep custody of or provide transport for specified arrested persons under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Allegany County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Narrow Subject(s):Allegany County
Arrests
Correctional Institutions -see also- Patuxent Institution
Correctional Officers
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Statutes:Article - Criminal Procedure
(2-106.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings35
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.