HB0264 (CH0611)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Juvenile Law - Juvenile Records - Disclosure

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611


Synopsis:Authorizing the Department of Juvenile Services to provide access to and confidential use of juvenile court records by specified state agencies under specified circumstances; repealing provisions that authorized access to and confidential use of a child's treatment plan under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Juvenile Law
Narrow Subject(s):Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Disclosure
Interstate Affairs
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Privacy
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(3-8A-27)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
1/25/20131/25/2013Hearing cancelled
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (129-9)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (45-1)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.