HB0277

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Children in Need of Assistance - Review Hearings

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Requiring the juvenile court to conduct specified hearings within specified periods of time to review the status of specified children under its jurisdiction; requiring the juvenile court to take specified actions at a review hearing under the Act; and establishing that a specified hearing to review a child's permanency plan satisfies the requirements for a review hearing under the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0264
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Foster Care
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(3-816.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {652012/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)47
Senate3/15/20133/15/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings46
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.