HB0278

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Expanding the proceedings for which a local department of social services is required to provide specified notice to preadoptive parents and foster parents of a child under specified circumstances and at which preadoptive parents and foster parents have the right to be heard; repealing a requirement that a local department of social services provide specified notice to specified relatives of a child and substituting a requirement that the local department provide specified notice to caregivers of a child; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0265
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Adoption
Attorneys
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Foster Care
Guardians
Juvenile Causes
Notices
Social Services -see also- Welfare
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(3-816.2, 3-823)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (135-2)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.