HB0282

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


Synopsis:Authorizing a person to file a specified petition for expungement of specified juvenile records; authorizing the court to order the expungement of a specified record under specified circumstances; requiring the court to consider specified criteria in its consideration of a specified petition for expungement of records; authorizing the court to rule on a petition for expungement with or without a hearing; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0229
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Juvenile Law
Narrow Subject(s):Age of Majority -see also- Minors
Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Expungement
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Petitions
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
State's Attorneys
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(3-8A-27.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
1/25/20131/25/2013Hearing cancelled
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {992217/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (111-27)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
4/1/20134/1/2013Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.