HB0286 (CH0809)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809


Synopsis:Increasing from $114,500 to $124,500 the limit on the maximum salary that the Board of Public Works may set for a clerk of a circuit court; and applying the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Dumais
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0668
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Narrow Subject(s):Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(2-504)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 31, 2018 12:57 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Judiciary
1/19/20181/19/2018Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
1/24/20181/24/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
3/19/20183/19/2018Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/19/20183/14/2018Favorable Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed48
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (96-41)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/26/20183/22/2018Favorable Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed53
3/27/20183/23/2018Third Reading Passed (46-1)54
House3/27/20183/20/2018Returned Passed54
Post Passage5/26/20185/26/2018Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:53 P.M.