HB0292 (CH0431)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of Sunset

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431


Synopsis:Altering a specified reporting requirement to require law enforcement agencies and the Department of State Police to report specified information regarding DNA collection and analysis to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention instead of the Office of Legislative Audits; repealing the termination date for specified provisions of the statewide DNA data base law applicable to the collection, analysis, and reporting of specified information relating to DNA; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Police)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Arrests
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Electronic Government
Genetics
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Statutes:Article - Public Safety
(2-514)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2008)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {562319/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (135-1)47
Senate3/15/20133/15/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings46
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (39-7)61
House4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.