HB0309

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Norman

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Authorizing a judgment creditor to obtain discovery in aid of enforcement of a money judgment entered or recorded in a circuit court or in the District Court by use of a court ordered examination under oath before a judge or examiner of a judgment debtor or any other person deemed by the court likely to possess or have knowledge of assets subject to execution; and establishing timing, notice, and procedural requirements for court ordered examinations in aid of enforcement of a money judgment.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Norman, Anderson, Braveboy, Cardin, Clippinger, Cluster, Dumais, Eckardt, Feldman, Frank, George, Ivey, Jacobs, James, K. Kelly, Krebs, Lafferty, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, Mitchell, Niemann, Otto, Reznik, Simmons, Smigiel, Stein, Stocksdale, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vitale, Wilson, and Wood
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0337 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Circuit Courts
Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments
District Courts
Examinations
Judgments
Notices
Summonses -see also- Subpoenas
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(11-404)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20131/24/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings35
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.