HB0311 (CH0366)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Crimes - Requirement to Report Death or Disappearance of Minor - Penalties

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly, K.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366


Synopsis:Requiring, under specified circumstances, a parent or other person who has permanent care or custody or responsibility for the supervision of a minor under the age of 13 to notify within 24 hours the appropriate law enforcement agency that the minor is a missing child; requiring, under specified circumstances, a parent or specified other person to notify, within 5 hours, the appropriate law enforcement agency or medical authority that the minor has died; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates K. Kelly, Arora, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Dumais, Hough, Lee, McComas, McDermott, Mitchell, Simmons, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, and Howard
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0020 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Reports
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-608, 3-609)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20131/24/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {232213/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.