HB0331 (CH0612)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Open Meetings Act - Violations and Penalties

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612


Synopsis:Requiring that a public body take specified actions if the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board determines that a violation of the Open Meetings Act has occurred; providing that compliance with specified provisions of the Act is not an admission to a specified violation and may not be used as evidence in a specified proceeding; repealing a prohibition on the introduction of opinions issued by the Board as evidence in specified proceedings; increasing the penalties for violations of the Open Meetings Act; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Morhaim, Barve, Bromwell, Costa, Hubbard, James, Kach, K. Kelly, Kipke, Lafferty, McMillan, W. Miller, Mizeur, O'Donnell, Pena-Melnyk, Smigiel, Stein, Tarrant, V. Turner, Hammen, Pendergrass, Cullison, Donoghue, Elliott, Frank, A. Kelly, Krebs, McDonough, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Ready, and Reznik
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0826
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Evidence
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Public Information
Signatures
Statutes:Article - State Government
(10-502.5, 10-510, 10-511)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20131/24/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/27/20132/27/2013Favorable with Amendments {786285/1 Report Adopted36
Second Reading Passed with Amendments36
3/1/20133/1/2013Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Bobo) Adopted 38
3/5/20133/5/2013Third Reading Passed (125-10)40
Senate3/6/20133/6/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs39
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.