HB0367

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process

Sponsored by:

Delegate Reznik

Status:

In the Senate - Second Reading Passed


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of Legislative Services, in the year immediately after the decennial United States Census, to obtain adjusted State census data and provide it, within 30 days of receipt, to the temporary redistricting commission established under the Act; requiring the commission to hold hearings at times likely to maximize public participation and in locations that represent the State's specified diversity; requiring the commission to adopt a congressional districting plan; providing a specified contingency; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Reznik, Barkley, Ebersole, Krimm, Lierman, Platt, Waldstreicher, K. Young, Angel, Brooks, Gibson, Hill, Lam, R. Lewis, A. Miller, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Tarlau, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0467 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Rules and Executive Nominations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Elections
Narrow Subject(s):Boundaries
Census -see also- Data; Demographics
Civil Rights Commission
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Constitutional Amendments
Court of Appeals
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Federal Government
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Governor
Hearings
Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills
Legislative Services, Department of
Lobbying
Maps and Charts
Public Information
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Referendum
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Statutes:Article - Election Law
(8-6A-01 through 8-6A-09)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2017 10:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20171/25/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {873622/164
Special Order until later today (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted 64
Favorable with Amendments {873622/164
Committee Amendment Adopted (88-49)64
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted64
Floor Amendment {223225/1 (Delegate Hill) Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/7/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed (87-51)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017First Reading Senate Rules62
4/10/20174/10/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/4/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.