HB0368

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Institutions of Higher Education - Hazing - Required Reporting and Education

Sponsored by:

Delegate Gibson

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations


Synopsis:Requiring the governing board of each institution of higher education to adopt and submit to the Maryland Higher Education Commission a written policy on hazing; requiring institutions of higher education to provide students with a certain educational program on hazing; requiring the Commission to take certain actions regarding hazing policies and to provide the General Assembly with an annual report on certain policies adopted, the number of hazing incidents reported, and the outcomes of the incidents by August 1; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Gibson, Ali, Anderton, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Conaway, Ebersole, Glenn, Hayes, Hill, Krimm, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, McCray, Moon, Morales, Mosby, Patterson, Proctor, Queen, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Harassment -see also- Threats
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Reports
Statutes:Article - Education
(11-1401)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 7, 2018 1:45 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Appropriations
1/26/20181/26/2018Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20184/7/2018Unfavorable Report by Appropriations

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 4:11 P.M.