HB0374

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with Disabilities

Sponsored by:

Delegate Malone

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Authorizing an individual to possess a specified number of special registration plates for individuals with disabilities for specified motorcycles in addition to the special registration plate and parking placards authorized under specified provisions of law.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Malone, Glenn, Frush, and Norman
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0212
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0825 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Narrow Subject(s):Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
License Plates
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Signs and Billboards
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(13-616, 13-616.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {270611/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Floor Amendment (Senator Stone) {533721/1 Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/5/20133/31/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (137-0)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.