HB0376 (CH0221)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Retirement and Pension System - Correction of Errors in Benefits

Sponsored by:

Delegate Griffith

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221


Synopsis:Altering the conditions under which the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System is required to correct an error that results in a retiree or beneficiary receiving a benefit that differs from the benefit the retiree or beneficiary is entitled to receive.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0269
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Pensions and Retirement
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
State Employees
Statutes:Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(21-113)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Appropriations
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable Report by Appropriations
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation31
3/6/20133/6/2013Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.