HB0382

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court Costs

Sponsored by:

Delegate Niemann

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


Synopsis:Requiring the imposition of specified court costs if a defendant is sentenced to probation before judgment for or pleads nolo contendere to a specified crime or offense.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Niemann
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0453 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Narrow Subject(s):Circuit Courts
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Criminal Injuries Compensation
District Courts
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Trials
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(7-409)
Article - Criminal Procedure
(11-819)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/24/20131/24/2013Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.