HB0385 (CH0435)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding Extension

Sponsored by:

Delegate Robinson, S.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435


Synopsis:Repealing the limitations on the requirement to provide specified funding in specified fiscal years to the Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program for specified purposes from the Environmental Trust Fund; requiring specified funding for the Corps Program each fiscal year; and extending to fiscal year 2020 the termination date of a surcharge on electrical energy distributed to retail electric customers in the State.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates S. Robinson, Arora, Barkley, Beidle, Bobo, Cane, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Holmes, Hucker, Ivey, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lafferty, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Niemann, Otto, Reznik, Summers, Wilson, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0027
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Natural Resources - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Chesapeake Bay
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Res; Fuel; Power Plants
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Environmental Trust
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Natural Resources, Department of
Power Plants
Public Service Commission
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Natural Resources
(3-302, 8-1913, 8-1921)
Article - Public Utilities
(7-203)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable with Amendments {970619/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (110-25)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs35
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.