HB0385 (CH0484)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Baltimore City - Abandoned Property - Tax Sales - Ground Rent

Sponsored by:

Delegate Anderson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484


Synopsis:Repealing a limitation on selling the whole fee simple interest in abandoned property in Baltimore City consisting of either a vacant lot or improved property cited as vacant and unfit for habitation when the property is subject to a ground rent or specified lease.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Abandoned Property
Baltimore City
Leases and Rent
Notices
Tax Sales
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(14-816)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/3/20162/3/2016Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/11/20163/11/2016Third Reading Passed (137-0)43
Senate3/14/20163/14/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation43
3/18/20163/18/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/7/20164/1/2016Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/11/20164/3/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
House4/11/20164/5/2016Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.