HB0389 (CH0397)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - Study

Sponsored by:

Delegate Rudolph

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397


Synopsis:Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to study and report on the status of its initiative to implement all-electronic tolling; requiring the study to address specified matters, including an analysis of all-electronic tolling in other states and a description of various all-electronic tolling programs; requiring the Authority to submit the report on or before January 1, 2016; and prohibiting the Authority from implementing all-electronic tolling at the Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge before January 1, 2016.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Rudolph, James, Norman, McComas, and Howard
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0730
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Ways and Means   View Committee HearingFinance   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Transportation - Highways
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Bridges and Tunnels
Electronic Government
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Highways
Reports
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20141/23/2014First Reading Ways and Means
1/24/20141/24/2014Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
3/3/20143/3/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable with Amendments {305566/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/6/20143/6/2014Third Reading Passed (136-0)42
Senate3/7/20143/7/2014First Reading Finance41
3/11/20143/11/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20144/2/2014Favorable Report by Finance
4/3/20143/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/5/20143/27/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20143/29/2014Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.