HB0395

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Joint Insurance Association - Insurers - Notice

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lafferty

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Requiring insurers that deny, cancel, or nonrenew specified coverage for essential property insurance or homeowner's insurance to provide notice to specified applicants or insureds of the possible availability of insurance coverage through the Joint Insurance Association under a specified provision of law or another plan; providing for the content and manner of providing the notice; and applying the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Lafferty, Brooks, Carey, and Glenn
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Insurance - Other than Health
Narrow Subject(s):Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Notices
Real Property
Statutes:Article - Insurance
(25-406, 27-602, 27-603, 19-117)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2/16/20162/16/2016Favorable Report by Economic Matters
2/17/20162/17/2016Favorable Report Adopted26
Second Reading Passed26
2/19/20162/19/2016Third Reading Passed (92-46)28
Senate2/22/20162/22/2016First Reading Finance28
3/16/20163/16/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.