HB0395

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - Report

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly

Status:

Veto sustained (0-140)


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2017, on methodologies to set child care subsidy reimbursement rates in the Child Care Subsidy Program; and requiring the report to contain specified information.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Kelly, Frick, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Jackson, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, McCray, A. Miller, Morales, Platt, Reznik, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and K. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0293
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Education - Miscellaneous
Children
Narrow Subject(s):Child Care
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 11, 2018 7:30 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20171/26/2017First Reading Appropriations
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20172/20/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
2/21/20172/21/2017Favorable Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed30
2/23/20172/23/2017Third Reading Passed (136-2)32
Senate2/24/20172/24/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation31
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/24/20173/22/2017Favorable Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed51
3/27/20173/23/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)52
House3/27/20173/22/2017Returned Passed56
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
House1/10/20181/10/2018Veto sustained (0-140)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 11, 2018 7:30 A.M.