HB0396 (CH0369)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cardin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from using an interactive computer service to maliciously engage in a specified course of conduct that inflicts serious emotional distress on a minor or places a minor in reasonable fear of death or serious bodily injury under specified circumstances; and defining terms.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Cardin, Afzali, DeBoy, Gilchrist, Jameson, Luedtke, W. Miller, Mitchell, Morhaim, Olszewski, Rosenberg, Stein, Stocksdale, and Walker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1052
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Harassment
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Pornography -see also- Nudity and Sexual Displays; Obscenity
Privacy
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-805)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing cancelled
2/11/20132/11/2013Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/22/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {382418/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/29/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.