HB0397 (CH0227)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Consent Orders - Shielding

Sponsored by:

Delegate Simmons

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227


Synopsis:Authorizing a petitioner to file a written request to shield court records relating to a peace order or protective order proceeding; authorizing the court to order the shielding of all court records relating to a peace order or protective order proceeding if the respondent consented to the entry of the peace order or protective order; requiring the court to balance specified considerations in determining whether to shield court records relating to a peace order or protective order proceeding; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Simmons, Dumais, Carter, Anderson, Arora, Conaway, Glass, K. Kelly, McComas, McDermott, Rosenberg, Smigiel, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vitale, Waldstreicher, and Costa
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Judiciary   View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Hearings
Notices
Petitions
Privacy
Protection Orders
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Rules and Regulations
Statutes of Limitation
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20141/23/2014First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/13/20142/13/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20143/13/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/13/20143/10/2014Favorable with Amendments {362517/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/14/20143/11/2014Third Reading Passed (106-29)47
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings47
3/26/20143/26/2014Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20144/4/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/4/20143/26/2014Favorable with Amendments {558078/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20143/28/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)62
House4/7/20144/2/2014House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (102-34)69
Passed Enrolled69
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.