HB0401 (CH0598)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks Required

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cullison

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598


Synopsis:Requiring applicants to the State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners to submit to a criminal history records check as a condition of licensure or registration; requiring the Boards to consider specified factors in determining whether to grant a license or registration on receipt of the criminal history record information; prohibiting the Boards from issuing a license or registration if the criminal history record information has not been received; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Cullison
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0381
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations   View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Chiropractors
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Fingerprinting
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Massage
Physical Therapists
Privacy
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20141/24/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20142/25/2014Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2/26/20142/26/2014Favorable Report Adopted36
Second Reading Passed36
2/28/20142/28/2014Special Order until 3/4 (Delegate Braveboy) Adopted 38
3/4/20143/4/2014Third Reading Passed (131-6)40
Senate3/5/20143/5/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs39
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20143/23/2014Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/2/20143/24/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)58
House4/3/20143/27/2014Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.