HB0405

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Frederick County - Board of License Commissioners - Expanded Membership

Sponsored by:

Frederick County Delegation

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Expanding the Board of License Commissioners in Frederick County from three to five members; and providing for the terms of the members.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Frederick County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(15-103)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Economic Matters
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/8/20133/8/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
3/15/20133/15/2013Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.