HB0408 (CH0258)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management Equipment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258


Synopsis:Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland individual and corporate income tax for specified expenses incurred to buy and install enhanced agricultural management equipment under specified circumstances; defining "enhanced agricultural management equipment"; applying the Act to tax years after December 31, 2012; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Conway, Afzali, Anderson, Aumann, Barkley, Bates, Beitzel, Bobo, Bohanan, Boteler, Cane, Cardin, Cullison, DeBoy, Donoghue, Dumais, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Feldman, Fisher, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Glass, Griffith, Gutierrez, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hixson, Holmes, Hubbard, Ivey, Jacobs, James, Jones, Kaiser, Kipke, Krebs, Lafferty, Love, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McIntosh, A. Miller, Norman, Otto, Proctor, Ready, S. Robinson, Rudolph, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Stifler, Stocksdale, Summers, Tarrant, Vallario, Vitale, A. Washington, Weir, Wood, George, Harper, Myers, and Stukes
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0404
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1309 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Agriculture
Narrow Subject(s):Agriculture -see also- Farmland
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Exemptions
Income Tax
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-208, 10-308)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {965160/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation51
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.