HB0420 (CH0113)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls

Sponsored by:

Chair, Environmental Matters Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113


Synopsis:Altering procedures of the Maryland Transportation Authority for the collection of unpaid tolls through a specified notice and a citation for toll violations; altering the contents of a specified citation; altering procedures for paying or contesting the amounts due under a citation; providing for the admissibility and prima facie effect of the information in a citation in any proceeding to contest liability; altering specified defenses to a citation; altering procedures for collection of unpaid tolls and civil penalties; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Citations
Court Costs
District Courts
Evidence
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Interstate Affairs
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Publications -see also- Maryland Register
Public Information
Recordings -see also- Video
Traffic Regulation
Video
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(7-301)
Article - State Government
(10-616)
Article - Transportation
(21-1414, 21-1415, 26-401, 27-110)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {470217/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Finance52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable with Amendments {827274/1 Report Adopted60
Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {843124/1 Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 61
House4/5/20133/31/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (136-0)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.