HB0425 (CH0844)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lierman

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844


Synopsis:Prohibiting the suspension or expulsion of prekindergarten, kindergarten, first grade, or second grade students from public schools with specified exceptions for an expulsion required by federal law or a suspension for not more than 5 school days under specified circumstances; requiring the principal or school administration to contact a student's parent or guardian under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Lierman, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Brooks, Conaway, Davis, Fennell, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, McCray, McIntosh, McKay, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Patterson, Queen, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, M. Washington, Sophocleus, Pena-Melnyk, and Ebersole
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0651
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Counselors -see also- Guidance Counselors; Social Workers
Discipline
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Guns
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Social Workers
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(4-319, 7-305, 7-305.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20171/26/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable with Amendments {525766/1 Report Adopted45
Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate Cassilly) Adopted 45
3/15/20173/12/2017Floor Amendment {773820/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (49-87)46
Floor Amendment {743428/4 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-91)46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20173/13/2017Third Reading Passed (91-48)47
Senate3/17/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {124732/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-11)61
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (90-46)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:00 P.M.