HB0428 (CH0114)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure to Public Institutions of Higher Education

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly, K.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114


Synopsis:Authorizing the disclosure of a report or record of child abuse or neglect to specified officials of specified public institutions of higher education for specified purposes if the abuse was committed under specified circumstances.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates K. Kelly, Dumais, and Simmons
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Children
Narrow Subject(s):Child Abuse and Neglect
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Disclosure
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
State Employees
State Universities and Colleges
Volunteers -see also- Maryland Service Corps
Statutes:Article - Human Services
(1-202)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/22/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {732112/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (131-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.