HB0430 (CH0371)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor Vehicles

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "motor vehicle" to expand the types of vehicles for which an occupant is prohibited from consuming or possessing an alcoholic beverage in the passenger area while on a highway.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages -see also- AB-By Subd; Subst Abuse; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Highways
Mopeds
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(10-123)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/29/20131/29/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs41
3/11/20133/11/2013Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings42
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.