HB0443 (CH0050)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal History Records Checks - Informal Child Care Providers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50


Synopsis:Altering provisions of law relating to individuals required to obtain a criminal history records check; requiring an adult known to be residing in an informal child care provider's home to obtain a criminal history records check; requiring specified informal child care providers to obtain a criminal history records check; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Dumais
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0413
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1330 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Child Care
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Statutes:Article - Family Law
(5-561, 5-562, 5-564)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (130-0)53A
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.