HB0462

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - Statewide Accounting of Sexual Assault Evidence Kits

Sponsored by:

Delegate Young, K.

Status:

Veto sustained (0-141)


Synopsis:Requiring a specified law enforcement agency or other State or local agency to conduct an inventory of specified sexual assault kit evidence on or before January 1, 2016; requiring a specified agency to prepare a report regarding untested sexual assault evidence collection kits on or before March 1, 2016; requiring the report to be submitted to the Attorney General; and requiring the Attorney General to prepare and submit to the General Assembly a specified report and specified recommendations on or before December 1, 2016.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates K. Young, Barron, Kaiser, and Smith
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0498
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Attorney General
Evidence
Genetics
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:42 P.M.